THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:02:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences - Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences - Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTON NIKOULINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKOULINE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTON NIKOULINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKOULINE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Apr 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017