THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:42:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Rheumatology
08 May 2018 to 01 Jun 2018
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
EL - Rheumatology
03 Jul 2017 to 28 Jul 2017
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - Rheumatology
DATE: 08 May 2018 to 01 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Rheumatology
DATE: 03 Jul 2017 to 28 Jul 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2017