THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Hennick Bridgepoint Hospital
Outpatient Clinic
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-8252
Extension: 2933
Fax: 416-461-2089
Address: 1-254 Main St N
Markham ON L3P 1Y7
Phone: 1-647-799-0966
Fax: 1-365-509-2995

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 02 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Hennick Bridgepoint Hospital
Outpatient Clinic
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-8252
Extension: 2933
Fax: 416-461-2089
Address: 1-254 Main St N
Markham ON L3P 1Y7
Phone: 1-647-799-0966
Fax: 1-365-509-2995

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 02 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AINSLEY CHRISTEL KEMPENAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEMPENAAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AINSLEY CHRISTEL KEMPENAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEMPENAAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 21 Sep 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017