THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:26:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-343 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3H 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-785-8412
Fax: 416-785-8324
Address: 55 Ameer Ave
Terraces of Baycrest
North York ON M6A 2Z1
Phone: 416-785-2500
Extension: 6513
Fax: 647-788-4399
Address: 60 Murray St
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Family and Community Medicine
4th Floor
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 5159
Fax: 416-586-3175
Address: 550 University Ave
University Health Network - Toronto Rehab Institute
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
2nd Floor - South Wing
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Phone: 416-597-3422
Extension: 3065
Fax: 416-597-7066

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-343 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3H 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-785-8412
Fax: 416-785-8324
Address: 55 Ameer Ave
Terraces of Baycrest
North York ON M6A 2Z1
Phone: 416-785-2500
Extension: 6513
Fax: 647-788-4399
Address: 60 Murray St
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Family and Community Medicine
4th Floor
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 5159
Fax: 416-586-3175
Address: 550 University Ave
University Health Network - Toronto Rehab Institute
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
2nd Floor - South Wing
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Phone: 416-597-3422
Extension: 3065
Fax: 416-597-7066

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLIOT HARRISON LASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LASS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLIOT HARRISON LASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LASS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017