THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:18:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph General Hospital
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph General Hospital
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILLIP GREGOIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREGOIRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILLIP GREGOIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREGOIRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017