THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:30:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 47 Liberty St S
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Emergency Department
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-623-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax-Pickering Hospital Lakeridge Health
Emergency Department
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: 1-905-683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Emergency Department
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 47 Liberty St S
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Emergency Department
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-623-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax-Pickering Hospital Lakeridge Health
Emergency Department
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: 1-905-683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Emergency Department
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAOMI MACRAE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACRAE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAOMI MACRAE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACRAE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017