THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Critical Care Medicine
03 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: EL - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 03 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017