THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:17:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pittsburgh, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Centenary Hospital
Galaxy 12 Child and Teen Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7476
Fax: 437-780-5548
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Child & Teen Clinic
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6590
Fax: 416-469-6591

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Pittsburgh, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Centenary Hospital
Galaxy 12 Child and Teen Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7476
Fax: 437-780-5548
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Child & Teen Clinic
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6590
Fax: 416-469-6591

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNIE LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNIE LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pittsburgh, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2023
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 08 Apr 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017