THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:33:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 585 Stn Lcd 1
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton West 5th Campus
Forensic Psychiatry Program
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 36262
Fax: 905-381-5605

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 585 Stn Lcd 1
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton West 5th Campus
Forensic Psychiatry Program
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 36262
Fax: 905-381-5605

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017