THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:30:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Wynford Dr
Suite 316
North York ON M3C 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-447-6176
Fax: 416-447-5750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Waqqas Jalil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Wynford Dr
Suite 316
North York ON M3C 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-447-6176
Fax: 416-447-5750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Waqqas Jalil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAQQAS NOOR JALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JALIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAQQAS NOOR JALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JALIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2017