THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:11:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017