THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:43:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 435 King Street North
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2Z5
Phone: (519) 603-0641
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 435 King Street North
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2Z5
Phone: (519) 603-0641
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW BLAIR DAWDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW BLAIR DAWDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017