THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:14:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College Dublin School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-2525 Old Bronte Rd
West Oak Medical Clinic
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905.582.7533
Fax: 905.582.0766
Address: 1145 Concession Rd
Langs Diabetes Clinic
Cambridge ON N3H 4L5
Phone: 519.653.1470
Extension: 285
Fax: 519.653.1285
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Pediatrics
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905.522.1155
Extension: 33255
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Halton Pediatric Diabetes
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905.338.4437
Fax: 905.815.5101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 26 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College Dublin School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-2525 Old Bronte Rd
West Oak Medical Clinic
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905.582.7533
Fax: 905.582.0766
Address: 1145 Concession Rd
Langs Diabetes Clinic
Cambridge ON N3H 4L5
Phone: 519.653.1470
Extension: 285
Fax: 519.653.1285
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Pediatrics
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905.522.1155
Extension: 33255
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Halton Pediatric Diabetes
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905.338.4437
Fax: 905.815.5101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 26 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW EVAN FELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW EVAN FELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College Dublin School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017