THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:53:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B5 - 4557 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 755-0505
Fax: (905) 755-0909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 May 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Iowa

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B5 - 4557 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 755-0505
Fax: (905) 755-0909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 May 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Iowa

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jun 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 23 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. FARAH ALI MAHMOUD SIAM may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. FARAH ALI MAHMOUD SIAM may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017