THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:33:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Feb 2022
31 Mar 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 02 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Mar 31 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Benyamin Rotberg may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Division of Child and Youth Mental Health, University
of Toronto, in which Dr. Rotberg holds an academic appointment at
the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Rotberg no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Rotberg's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Rotberg's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on April 1, 202. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on March 31, 2027.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Benyamin Rotberg may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Division of Child and Youth Mental Health, University
of Toronto, in which Dr. Rotberg holds an academic appointment at
the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Rotberg no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Rotberg's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Rotberg's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on April 1, 202. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on March 31, 2027.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Mar 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Mar 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017