THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:11:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QUINTON SEAN BARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QUINTON SEAN BARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017