THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:39:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-5550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-5550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL FRANCIS BRAVO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAVO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL FRANCIS BRAVO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAVO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017