THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3585
Lawrence Avenue East
Unit 1A
Scarborough Ontario M1G 1P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 431-0736
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 14-20 Red Maple Dr
Mediplus Pharmacy and Walk-In Clinic
Brampton ON L6X 4L8
Phone: 905-452-7771
Fax: 905-452-0666
Address: 210-90 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5B 3C3
Phone: 9054604904
Fax: 2897142520

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3585
Lawrence Avenue East
Unit 1A
Scarborough Ontario M1G 1P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 431-0736
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 14-20 Red Maple Dr
Mediplus Pharmacy and Walk-In Clinic
Brampton ON L6X 4L8
Phone: 905-452-7771
Fax: 905-452-0666
Address: 210-90 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5B 3C3
Phone: 9054604904
Fax: 2897142520

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARAYAN CHATTERGOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATTERGOON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARAYAN CHATTERGOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATTERGOON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017