THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:03:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Aug 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Aug 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 08 Aug 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017