THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:27:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Maternal and Fetal
Obstetrics and gynecology
600 University avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Maternal and Fetal
Obstetrics and gynecology
600 University avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Oct 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 19 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SHIRI SHINAR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Division of Maternal and Fetal Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. SHINAR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. SHINAR no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SHIRI SHINAR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Division of Maternal and Fetal Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. SHINAR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. SHINAR no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017