THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:16:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 2004
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2017