THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:38:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 17000 Stn Forces
Kingston ON K7K 7B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 541 5010
Extension: 5500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 17000 Stn Forces
Kingston ON K7K 7B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 541 5010
Extension: 5500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABRINA ELIZABETH ALEXANDRA DZAFOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZAFOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABRINA ELIZABETH ALEXANDRA DZAFOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZAFOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2023
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 22 Sep 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017