THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:33:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Gordon St
Whitby ON L1N 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054304055o/only Ontario Shores inpatientsts
Fax: 9056652430 (don't send referrals to this fax)
Address: 3292 Bayview Ave
North York ON M2M 4J5
Phone: 4162229955not accepting new patients
Fax: 4162228088
Address: 700 Gordon St W
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 668-5881
Extension: 6245
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Gordon St
Whitby ON L1N 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054304055o/only Ontario Shores inpatientsts
Fax: 9056652430 (don't send referrals to this fax)
Address: 3292 Bayview Ave
North York ON M2M 4J5
Phone: 4162229955not accepting new patients
Fax: 4162228088
Address: 700 Gordon St W
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 668-5881
Extension: 6245
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2017