THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:57:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 Government Rd
Wawa Ontario P0S 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 856-1313
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Blanche River Health Englehart
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 Government Rd
Wawa Ontario P0S 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 856-1313
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Blanche River Health Englehart
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNICA RUTH SWITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWITZER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNICA RUTH SWITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWITZER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2017