THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:00:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207-189 Kent St W
Lindsay ON K9V 5G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053209916
Fax: 7053208856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Dec 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207-189 Kent St W
Lindsay ON K9V 5G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053209916
Fax: 7053208856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Dec 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMON TIMOTHY ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMON TIMOTHY ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leicester, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2017