THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:34:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Springwater Health Center
Springwater Medical
201 - 1017 Carson Rd
Springwater Ontario L9X 0V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 252-1234
Fax: 705-252-3819

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Springwater Health Center
Springwater Medical
201 - 1017 Carson Rd
Springwater Ontario L9X 0V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 252-1234
Fax: 705-252-3819

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON EDWARD SPENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENCE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON EDWARD SPENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENCE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2017