THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:16:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 154 Civic Centre Rd
Petawawa ON K8H 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136877641
Fax: 6136876808
Address: 80 McGonigal St W
Arnprior ON K7S 1M3
Phone: 1-844-727-6404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 154 Civic Centre Rd
Petawawa ON K8H 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136877641
Fax: 6136876808
Address: 80 McGonigal St W
Arnprior ON K7S 1M3
Phone: 1-844-727-6404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARNAZ BABANOROUZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABANOROUZI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARNAZ BABANOROUZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABANOROUZI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2017