THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:12:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 366 Bloor Street East
City Family Doctor Clinic
Sherbourn Station Medical Clinic
Unit 6
Toronto Ontario M4W 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-926-1006
Fax: 647-417-7080
Address: 1901 Yonge St
Davisville Medical Clinic
#4
Toronto ON M4S 1Y6
Phone: (416) 483-0102
Fax: (416) 483-9393
Address: 1188 Danforth Ave
Danforth Greenwood Walk-in Clinic
Toronto ON M4J 1M3
Phone: (416) 778-6777
Fax: (416) 778-7776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Aug 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 366 Bloor Street East
City Family Doctor Clinic
Sherbourn Station Medical Clinic
Unit 6
Toronto Ontario M4W 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-926-1006
Fax: 647-417-7080
Address: 1901 Yonge St
Davisville Medical Clinic
#4
Toronto ON M4S 1Y6
Phone: (416) 483-0102
Fax: (416) 483-9393
Address: 1188 Danforth Ave
Danforth Greenwood Walk-in Clinic
Toronto ON M4J 1M3
Phone: (416) 778-6777
Fax: (416) 778-7776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Aug 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SERENA LILLIAN MARY MENEZES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENEZES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SERENA LILLIAN MARY MENEZES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENEZES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2017