THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:26:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2019 to 13 Aug 2019
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
14 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2018 to 13 Aug 2018
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
06 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
14 Aug 2017 to 05 Nov 2017
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 13 Aug 2019
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 14 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 13 Aug 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 06 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 14 Aug 2017 to 05 Nov 2017
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2017