THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:04:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stoufville Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stoufville Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YAMAN KHATTAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATTAB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YAMAN KHATTAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATTAB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2017