THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:56:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: George Washington University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 214-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 695-3866
Fax: 416-309-0495
Address: 10 Four Seasons Pl
Etobicoke ON M9B 6H7
Phone: +1 905-271-7777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Sep 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: George Washington University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 214-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 695-3866
Fax: 416-309-0495
Address: 10 Four Seasons Pl
Etobicoke ON M9B 6H7
Phone: +1 905-271-7777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Sep 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Mar 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 08 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sheliza Lalani may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
endocrinology and metabolism.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sheliza Lalani may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
endocrinology and metabolism.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: George Washington University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2017