THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:06:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kottayam Medical College, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kottayam Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kottayam Medical College, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Aug 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Oct 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2017