THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:38:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-314 Central Park Dr
Ottawa ON K2C 0R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-728-0608
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6-314 Central Park Dr
Central Park Medical Clinic
Suite 6
Ottawa ON K2C 0R2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-314 Central Park Dr
Ottawa ON K2C 0R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-728-0608
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6-314 Central Park Dr
Central Park Medical Clinic
Suite 6
Ottawa ON K2C 0R2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUANA FARREN-DAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARREN-DAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUANA FARREN-DAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARREN-DAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2017