THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:39:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Polyclinic Family & Specialty
Medicine Facility
Unit A4
2 Champagne Dr
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Polyclinic Family & Specialty
Medicine Facility
Unit A4
2 Champagne Dr
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2017