THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:52:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
EL - Colorectal Surgery
23 Oct 2017 to 19 Nov 2017
University of Toronto
EL - Colorectal Surgery
25 Sep 2017 to 22 Oct 2017
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Colorectal Surgery
DATE: 23 Oct 2017 to 19 Nov 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Colorectal Surgery
DATE: 25 Sep 2017 to 22 Oct 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2017