THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Colombia, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Colombia, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Colombia, 1997
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
19 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Neurology
26 Sep 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 19 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 26 Sep 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2017