THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:46:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Division of General Surgery
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Division of General Surgery
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAREEF ABDULRAHMAN M ALQAHTANI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALQAHTANI is enrolled at The University of Western Ontario;
(2) Dr. ALQAHTANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALQAHTANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALQAHTANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALQAHTANI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALQAHTANI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAREEF ABDULRAHMAN M ALQAHTANI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALQAHTANI is enrolled at The University of Western Ontario;
(2) Dr. ALQAHTANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALQAHTANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALQAHTANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALQAHTANI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALQAHTANI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - R - General Surgery
01 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
EL - General Surgery
16 Oct 2017 to 30 Nov 2017
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - R - General Surgery
01 Oct 2017 to 15 Oct 2017
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - General Surgery
DATE: 16 Oct 2017 to 30 Nov 2017
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Oct 2017 to 15 Oct 2017
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2017