THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:25:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1585 Kenaston Blvd
#14
Winnipeg MB R3P 2N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2044105200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Nov 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1585 Kenaston Blvd
#14
Winnipeg MB R3P 2N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2044105200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Nov 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. APRYL PAMINTUAN LOPEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. APRYL PAMINTUAN LOPEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2017