THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 00:02:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-945-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montréal Rd
Canadian Forces Health Services Center Ottawa
Physiatry Department
5th Floor
Gloucester ON K1A 0S2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 320 March Rd
suite 300
Kanata ON K2K 2E3
Phone: 613-763-1510
Fax: 613-270-0982

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 04 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-945-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montréal Rd
Canadian Forces Health Services Center Ottawa
Physiatry Department
5th Floor
Gloucester ON K1A 0S2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 320 March Rd
suite 300
Kanata ON K2K 2E3
Phone: 613-763-1510
Fax: 613-270-0982

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 04 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODY-LYNN YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODY-LYNN YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2017