THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:34:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2008
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2018 to 31 Oct 2018
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
24 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Queen's University
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Nov 2017 to 23 Jan 2018
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Oct 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 24 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Nov 2017 to 23 Jan 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2017