THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Larch Street
208-65 Larch St
Greater Sudbury Ontario
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2505210054
Fax: 7055237351
Address: 433 -865 Regent St
Sudbury
ON , Canada
P3E3Y9
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
Phone: 705 523-7343
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 26 Apr 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Ireland
South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Andre de Greef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Feb 2025

Corporation Name: Dr. Andre De Greef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jun 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, DUTCH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Larch Street
208-65 Larch St
Greater Sudbury Ontario
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2505210054
Fax: 7055237351
Address: 433 -865 Regent St
Sudbury
ON , Canada
P3E3Y9
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
Phone: 705 523-7343
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 26 Apr 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Ireland
South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Andre de Greef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Feb 2025

Corporation Name: Dr. Andre De Greef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jun 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE DE GREEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE GREEF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE DE GREEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE GREEF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2017