THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:20:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 640 Ross Ave E
Suite 1A
Timmins ON P4N 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-269-0415
Fax: 705-269-0414

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 640 Ross Ave E
Suite 1A
Timmins ON P4N 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-269-0415
Fax: 705-269-0414

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAYLA DOROTHY ILENE CYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAYLA DOROTHY ILENE CYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Oct 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2018