THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-200 Catharine St
Port Colborne ON L3K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-834-4546
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-200 Catharine St
Port Colborne ON L3K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-834-4546
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JONATHAN VANDENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDENBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JONATHAN VANDENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDENBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2023
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2017