THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:51:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1428 Highway 2
Medical Trust Clinic
Second floor
Courtice ON L1E 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057287915
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1471 Harmony Rd N
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5540 Baldwin Street South
Unit 4
Whitby Ontario L1M 1T5
Phone: 9053645300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Mar 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Aug 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 22 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1428 Highway 2
Medical Trust Clinic
Second floor
Courtice ON L1E 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057287915
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1471 Harmony Rd N
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5540 Baldwin Street South
Unit 4
Whitby Ontario L1M 1T5
Phone: 9053645300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Mar 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Aug 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 22 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Mar 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 22 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GAJANANAN NARENDRA may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GAJANANAN NARENDRA may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2017