THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4514 Queen Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 2L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2892966006
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4514 Queen Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 2L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2892966006
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Apr 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 11 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Pouria Sadeghi may practise medicine independently in family medicine.




VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Pouria Sadeghi may practise medicine independently in family medicine.




Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2017