THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:38:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAWAR DAKHALLAH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DAKHALLAH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DAKHALLAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DAKHALLAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DAKHALLAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DAKHALLAH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DAKHALLAH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAWAR DAKHALLAH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DAKHALLAH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DAKHALLAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DAKHALLAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DAKHALLAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DAKHALLAH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DAKHALLAH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
02 Aug 2021 to 27 Aug 2021
University of Toronto
EL - Paediatric Haematology
15 Jan 2018 to 11 Feb 2018
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 02 Aug 2021 to 27 Aug 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Paediatric Haematology
DATE: 15 Jan 2018 to 11 Feb 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2017