THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:28:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Arabian Gulf University College of Medicine and Medical Sciences, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Arabian Gulf University College of Medicine and Medical Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Arabian Gulf University College of Medicine and Medical Sciences, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Medical Oncology
04 Jun 2018 to 15 Jun 2018
McMaster University
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
12 Feb 2018 to 09 Mar 2018
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: EL - Medical Oncology
DATE: 04 Jun 2018 to 15 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
DATE: 12 Feb 2018 to 09 Mar 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2018