THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 20:16:00 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
Victoria Hospital
Department of Obstetrics & Gynecology
B2-461
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 55640
Fax: (519) 685-8497
Address: 373 Commissioners Road West
London Ontario N6J 1Y4
Phone: (519) 685-8713
Fax: (519) 646-6345

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
Victoria Hospital
Department of Obstetrics & Gynecology
B2-461
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 55640
Fax: (519) 685-8497
Address: 373 Commissioners Road West
London Ontario N6J 1Y4
Phone: (519) 685-8713
Fax: (519) 646-6345

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMARA OLEANDRA MARTA KUZMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUZMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMARA OLEANDRA MARTA KUZMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUZMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2018