THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:20:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2019 to 18 Aug 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
26 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
01 Jan 2018 to 25 Mar 2018
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 18 Aug 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 26 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jan 2018 to 25 Mar 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2018