THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:52:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud Bin Abdulaziz University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud Bin Abdulaziz University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud Bin Abdulaziz University, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Cardiology
01 Jul 2018 to 14 Jul 2018
McMaster University
EL - Cardiology
04 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
EL - Cardiology
09 Apr 2018 to 06 May 2018
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 14 Jul 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 04 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 09 Apr 2018 to 06 May 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 May 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 May 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2018